Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Wright, Barney , Warren County Treasurer, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Watkins, Christopher A., against Lee, Jessica R., Liberty Springs Homeowners Assoc Inc, in the jurisdiction of Warren County, OH, . Warren County, OH Superior Courts with TEPE, TIMOTHY N. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTEPE, TIMOTHY N. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 01, 2023 |
CategoryForeclosures |
Last RefreshedNovember 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWarren County, OH |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 23, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL APPEALABLE ORDER NOTICE MAILED TO ATTYS OR PARTIES | |
October 23, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTRY AND DECREE OF FORECLOSURE (JOURNAL BOOK 1362 PAGE 890) | |
September 20, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING SENT | |
September 20, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFAULT HEARING SET FOR 10/23/2023 AT 1:15 PM IN HRD/ , HEARD BY: TEPE, TIMOTHY N. | |
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFAULT HEARING SET FOR 09/22/2023 AT 10:00 AM IN HRD/ , HEARD BY: MOLL, MARKUS L | |
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE SCHEDULE SET | |
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFAULT HEARING SET FOR 09/22/2023 AT 10:00 AM IN HRD/ , HEARD BY: TEPE, TIMOTHY N. | |
August 16, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND DECREE OF FORECLOSURE | |
August 16, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF BARNEY WRIGHT, WARREN COUNTY TREASURER | |
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 08/15/2023 AT 1:00 PM IN HRD/ , HEARD BY: MOLL, MARKUS L |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.