Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Knowles, Linda J., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Muhammad, Frank S., in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with Mark Boessenecker presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 31, 2007 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1203 days |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time1203 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Stipulation 913510-Stipulation Filed/Issued By: 931220 - Attorney for Petitioner STIPULATION [913510] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PETITIONER [931220] |
|
December 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Converted Stat Closure Disposition Date: Dec 16 2010 Type: 944110 - Judgment/Order Manner : 942110 - After Hearing |
|
December 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Judgment 926110-Judgment Add'l Description: Stipulated Filed/Issued By: 931220 - Attorney for Petitioner JUDGMENT [926110] Motion: Additional Description : STIPULATED Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PETITIONER [931220] |
|
December 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice 912910-Notice Filed/Issued By: 931220 - Attorney for Petitioner NOTICE [912910] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PETITIONER [931220] |
|
December 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
Minute Order 913610-Minute Order Filed/Issued By: MINUTE ORDER [913610] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
|
December 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause (Non-DCSS) 931240-OSC Hearing (Enforcement); Knowles, L. vs. Muhammad, F. Motion OSC Details: 911170 - Contempt/Failure to Comply ; Judge: J21196 Price Diane Judge: Price, Diane |
|
December 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause (Non-DCSS) 931210-OSC Hearing; Knowles, L. vs. Muhammad, F. Motion OSC Details: 911130 - Attorney's Fees ; Judge: J21196 Price Diane Judge: Price, Diane |
|
December 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
Declaration 913310-Declaration Filed/Issued By: 932220 - Attorney for Respondent DECLARATION [913310] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR RESPONDENT [932220] |
|
December 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
Opposition or Objections 924210-Opposition/Objections Filed/Issued By: 932220 - Attorney for Respondent OPPOSITION/OBJECTIONS [924210] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR RESPONDENT [932220] |
|
December 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause (Non-DCSS) 931240-OSC Hearing (Enforcement); Knowles, L. vs. Muhammad, F. Motion OSC Details: 911170 - Contempt/Failure to Comply ; Judge: J21196 Price Diane Judge: Price, Diane |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.