Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Jp Morgan Chase Bank N A, filed a(n) Other Civil case represented by Goldstein, Jessica E, against Abiba, Obafemi, in the jurisdiction of Warren County, OH, . Warren County, OH Superior Courts with PEELER, ROBERT W. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2023 |
CategoryOther Civil |
Last RefreshedNovember 11, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWarren County, OH |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL PRETRIAL SET FOR 07/10/2024 AT 10:00 AM IN PHONE/ , HEARD BY: BESL, CAROLYN C | |
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event | BENCH TRIAL SET FOR 07/23/2024 AT 9:00 AM IN HRE/ , HEARD BY: BESL, CAROLYN C | |
September 27, 2023 | Docket Event | SCHEDULING ORDER (JOURNAL BOOK 1358 PAGE 377) | |
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event | MAGISTRATE'S ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (JOURNAL BOOK 1345 PAGE 774) | |
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 09/27/2023 AT 9:30 AM IN PHONE/ , HEARD BY: BESL, CAROLYN C | |
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE SCHEDULE SET | |
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 07/17/2023 AT 11:00 AM IN PHONE/ , HEARD BY: BESL, CAROLYN C | |
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE SCHEDULE SET | |
May 12, 2023 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S INITIAL DISCLOSURES PURSUANT TO CIVIL RULE 26(B)(3) | |
May 12, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.