Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Askren, Jessica, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Dame, Juliette Gaffney, against Askren, Matthew, in the jurisdiction of Warren County, OH, . Warren County, OH Superior Courts with KIRBY, JEFFREY T. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKIRBY, JEFFREY T. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 03, 2021 |
CategoryDiss Mar With Child |
Last RefreshedJuly 14, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWarren County, OH |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event | SEMINAR FOR DIVORCING PARENTS CERTIFICATE/DEF | |
May 04, 2021 | Docket Event | SEMINAR FOR DIVORCING PARENTS CERTIFICATE/PLT | |
May 03, 2021 | Docket Event | DISSOLUTION HEARING SET FOR 07/08/2021 AT 2:30 PM IN 1/ , HEARD BY: KIRBY, JEFFREY T. | |
May 03, 2021 | Docket Event | PERSONAL HISTORY OF PARTIES TO DIVORCE,DISSOLUTION OR LEGAL SEPARATION | |
May 03, 2021 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY: DAME, JULIETTE GAFFNEY ASSIGNED | |
May 03, 2021 | Docket Event | SHARED PARENTING PLAN | |
May 03, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF MATTHEW ASKREN INCOME,EXPENSES & FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE | |
May 03, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 05/03/2021 CASE NUMBER 21DR042612 | |
May 03, 2021 | Docket Event | JUDGE KIRBY, JEFFREY T.: ASSIGNED | |
May 03, 2021 | Docket Event | SEPARATION AGREEMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.