Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Longbridge Financial Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Rodriguez, Benjamin M., against Doe, Jane, Green, Terry, Green, Clyde W, United States Of America Secretary Of Housing And Urban Development, in the jurisdiction of Warren County, OH, . Warren County, OH Superior Courts with ODA II, DONALD E. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeODA II, DONALD E. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 07, 2021 |
CategoryForeclosures |
Last RefreshedNovember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWarren County, OH |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event | LABELS ONLY | |
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event | ENTRY CONFIRMING SALE AND ORDERING DEED AND DISTRIBUTION (JOURNAL BOOK 1306 PAGE 927) | |
October 07, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR ORDER CONFIRMING SALE AND ORDERING DEED AND DISTRIBUTION | |
October 03, 2022 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF COSTS | |
September 27, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER OF SALE RETD & FILED SHERIFF WARREN CO (PROPERTY PURCHASED BY MANDY THOMAS ON 9/26/22) | |
September 22, 2022 | Docket Event | PUBLICATION RET'D & FILED TODAY'S PULSE | |
August 29, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SHERIFF'S SALE | |
August 22, 2022 | Docket Event | REAL ESTATE APPRAISAL | |
August 10, 2022 | Docket Event | PRECIPE FOR ORDER OF SALE BY SHERIFF-$300 PAID | |
August 10, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER OF SALE ISSUED SHERIFF WARREN COUNTY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.