Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Albarran Urioste, Agustina, filed a(n) General Family - Family case represented by Porter, Greg D, against Landeros Diaz, Jesus Adrian, in the jurisdiction of Warren County, OH, . Warren County, OH Superior Courts with KIRBY, JEFFREY T. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKIRBY, JEFFREY T. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2020 |
CategoryAll Other Dr Cases |
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWarren County, OH |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 18, 2021 | Docket Event | ENTRY CONFIRMING REGISTRATION OF FOREIGN CHILD CUSTODY ORDER (JOURNAL BOOK 1222 PAGE 489) | |
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURNED-COMPLETED (SVC ISSUED 12/30/20) TO JESUS ADRIAN LANDEROS DIAZ: CM ON 1/15/21 BY ? | |
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURNED-NOT COMPLETED (SVC ISSUED | |
December 30, 2020 | Docket Event | FILE FOLDER LABEL | |
December 30, 2020 | Docket Event | PETITION TO REGISTER FOREIGN DECREE | |
December 30, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 12/30/2020 CASE NUMBER 20DR042377 | |
December 30, 2020 | Docket Event | JUDGE KIRBY, JEFFREY T.: ASSIGNED | |
December 30, 2020 | Docket Event | INFORMATION FOR PARENTING PROCEEDING AFFIDAVIT (O.R.C. 3127.23) | |
December 30, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF REGISTRATION OF CUSTODY ORDER & OPPORTUNITY TO CONTEST | |
December 30, 2020 | Docket Event | LABELS ONLY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.