Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Kraus, Elaine K., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Kraus, Douglas R., in the jurisdiction of Warren County, OH, . Warren County, OH Superior Courts with KIRBY, JEFFREY T. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKIRBY, JEFFREY T. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2020 |
CategoryMarr Term No Child |
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWarren County, OH |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL APPEALABLE ORDER NOTICE MAILED TO ATTYS OR PARTIES | |
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL (JOURNAL BOOK 1295 PAGE 474) | |
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event | TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 05/28/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN 1/ , HEARD BY: KIRBY, JEFFREY T. PER 2/23/21 SCHEDULING ORDER. | |
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE MAILED EMAILED | |
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENSE ATTORNEY: HUBBELL, MARTIN E. ASSIGNED | |
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event | AGREED ENTRY (JOURNAL BOOK 1295 PAGE 475) | |
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event | AGREED ENTRY | |
February 02, 2021 | Docket Event | AGREED ENTRY (JOURNAL BOOK 1295 PAGE 476) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.