Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bennett, Christina Elizabeth, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Scott, Christopher Zane, in the jurisdiction of Warren County, OH, . Warren County, OH Superior Courts with KIRBY, JEFFREY T. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKIRBY, JEFFREY T. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2020 |
CategoryDiss Mar With Child |
Last RefreshedJuly 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWarren County, OH |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event | ENTRY ADDING AN ARREARS ORDER | |
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL APPEALABLE ORDER NOTICE MAILED TO ATTYS OR PARTIES | |
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ENTRY OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE (JOURNAL BOOK 1221 PAGE 885) | |
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event | LABELS ONLY *CERTIFIED COPY OF FINAL DECREE MAILED TO PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT* | |
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event | DISSOLUTION BY TELEPHONE SET FOR 02/08/2021 AT 3:00 PM IN 1/ , HEARD BY: KIRBY, JEFFREY T. | |
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE MAILED TO | |
December 30, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR PARENTING CLASS (JOURNAL BOOK 1216 PAGE 388) | |
December 30, 2020 | Docket Event | PARENTING PLAN | |
December 30, 2020 | Docket Event | SEMINAR FOR DIVORCING PARENTS CERTIFICATE/DEF | |
December 30, 2020 | Docket Event | JUDGE KIRBY, JEFFREY T.: ASSIGNED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.