Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
King, Alison M., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Showen, Jason A., against King, Eric L., in the jurisdiction of Warren County, OH, . Warren County, OH Superior Courts with KIRBY, JEFFREY T. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKIRBY, JEFFREY T. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 16, 2020 |
CategoryDiss Mar With Child |
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWarren County, OH |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL APPEALABLE ORDER NOTICE MAILED TO ATTYS OR PARTIES | |
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event | DECREE OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE (JOURNAL BOOK 1221 PAGE 93) | |
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event | LABELS ONLY - RM SVC | |
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event | MAGISTRATE'S DECISION RECOMMENDING DISSOLUTION DECREE | |
January 27, 2021 | Docket Event | DISSOLUTION BY TELEPHONE SET FOR 01/29/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN HRA/ , HEARD BY: RUSSELL, W. SCOTT RESET AS MR. KING WAS UNAVAILABLE ON 1/25/21 | |
December 17, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE MAILED TO | |
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF ERIC KING INCOME,EXPENSES & FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE | |
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event | INFORMATION FOR PARENTING PROCEEDING AFFIDAVIT (O.R.C. 3127.23) -----------ALISON KING | |
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 12/16/2020 CASE NUMBER 20DR042354 | |
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event | PERSONAL HISTORY OF PARTIES TO DIVORCE,DISSOLUTION OR LEGAL SEPARATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.