Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Tolston, Kayla, filed a(n) Custody,Visitation - Family case against Tolston, Michael, in the jurisdiction of Warren County, OH, . Warren County, OH Superior Courts with KIRBY, JEFFREY T. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKIRBY, JEFFREY T. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 15, 2020 |
CategoryVisitation Change |
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWarren County, OH |
Matter TypeCustody,Visitation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 29, 2022 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA FOR WITNESS WITH CIVIL RULE 45(C) PROTECTION NOTICE ORDER TO APPEAR | |
December 27, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO CONTINUE TRIAL (JOURNAL BOOK 1316 PAGE 787) | |
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER & ENTRY (JOURNAL BOOK 1316 PAGE 368) | |
December 20, 2022 | Docket Event | TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 01/03/2023 AT 3:45 PM IN 1/ , HEARD BY: KIRBY, JEFFREY T. | |
December 20, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTORNEYS AND GAL | |
December 20, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTHER'S PROPOSED SHARED PARENTING PLAN | |
December 09, 2022 | Docket Event | TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 12/14/2022 AT 3:30 PM IN 1/ , HEARD BY: KIRBY, JEFFREY T. (VACATED PER THE COURTS REQUEST) | |
December 09, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE MAILED | |
November 18, 2022 | Docket Event | TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 12/08/2022 AT 11:30 AM IN 1/ , HEARD BY: KIRBY, JEFFREY T. | |
November 18, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTORNEYS AND GAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.