Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Putman, Maryann, filed a(n) Other Civil case represented by Izzo, John A., against Allstate Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Warren County, OH, . Warren County, OH Superior Courts with ODA II, DONALD E. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeODA II, DONALD E. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2020 |
CategoryOther Civil |
Last RefreshedJuly 18, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationWarren County, OH |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event | FILE FOLDER LABEL | |
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS SUCCESSFUL SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL ISSUED 12/30/21 TO: ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY C/O CT CORPORATION SYSTEM: CM ON ? BY DANIEL D KELLEY | |
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event | FILE FOLDER LABEL | |
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO STATE COURT AND ADVERSE PARTIES OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT (JOURNAL BOOK 1217 PAGE 786) | |
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF REMOVAL | |
December 31, 2020 | Docket Event | PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING SET FOR 01/13/2021 AT 2:00 PM IN HRD/ , HEARD BY: CROSSLEY-TATE, PAIGE | |
December 31, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING ISSUED | |
December 30, 2020 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF MARYANN PUTMAN'S MOTION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION | |
December 30, 2020 | Docket Event | JUDGE ODA II, DONALD E.: ASSIGNED | |
December 30, 2020 | Docket Event | FILE FOLDER LABEL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.