Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Assured Administration Llc, filed a(n) Notice Of Appeal case against Davis, Marc, Sarchet, Bethany, Yeoman, Steve, Young, Thomas, in the jurisdiction of Warren County, OH, . Warren County, OH Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2020 |
CategoryNotice Of Appeal |
Last RefreshedNovember 11, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWarren County, OH |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event | ENTRY OF CONSOLIDATION-ALL FILINGS TRANSFERRED TO CASE NO. 2020-11-078 (JOURNAL BOOK 1220 PAGE 504) | |
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event | CONSOLIDATED TO 2020-11-078 | |
December 31, 2020 | Docket Event | TRANSCRIPT OF DOCKET & JOURNAL ENTRIES | |
December 30, 2020 | Docket Event | LABELS ONLY | |
December 30, 2020 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY: PARKER, GEORGE M. ASSIGNED | |
December 30, 2020 | Docket Event | DEFENSE ATTORNEY: KENNEY, JEFFREY T. ASSIGNED | |
December 29, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 12/29/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020-12-093 | |
December 29, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED (COURT OF APPEALS) 17CV89876 (JUDGE ODA) ENTRY ON 11/30/2020 | |
December 29, 2020 | Docket Event | CIVIL DOCKET STATEMENT FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.