Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Owens, Brandon Alexander, filed a(n) Notice Of Appeal case represented by Napolitano, Gregory A., against Entitity, Kings Local School District, Board Of Education Of Kings Local School District, Doe, John, Ackerman, Timothy A., (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Warren County, OH, . Warren County, OH Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2017 |
CategoryNotice Of Appeal |
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWarren County, OH |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 15, 2020 | Docket Event | FILED IN COA BOX 231 | |
March 28, 2018 | Docket Event | CLERK'S COMMENT - SEPARATED 2017-12-180 FROM 16CV088828 | |
March 20, 2018 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF COSTS | |
March 08, 2018 | Docket Event | ENTRY OF DISMISSAL FILED (JOURNAL BOOK 1081 PAGE 484) | |
March 08, 2018 | Docket Event | LABELS ONLY | |
March 08, 2018 | Docket Event | MAILED COPY OF FILING ON 3-9-18 C/O GREGORY NAPOLITANO 4310 HUNT RD CIN OH 45242 | |
March 08, 2018 | Docket Event | MAILED COPY OF THE FILING ON 3-9-18 C/O 1714 W GALBRAITH RD CIN OH 45239 | |
March 08, 2018 | Docket Event | MAILED COPY OF FILING ON 3-9-18 C/O CHRISTOPHER ALEXANDER 423 READING RD MASON OH 45040 | |
February 20, 2018 | Docket Event | APPELLANT'S NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OF APPEAL | |
February 20, 2018 | Docket Event | MAILED COPY OF FILING ON 2-21-18 C/O COA 12TH APPELLATE DISTRICT 1001 REINARTZ BLVD MIDDLETOWN OH 45042 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.