Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Russell, Christopher M, filed a(n) Notice Of Appeal case represented by Pro Se, against Warden Lebanon Correctional Institution, in the jurisdiction of Warren County, OH, . Warren County, OH Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2017 |
CategoryNotice Of Appeal |
Last RefreshedNovember 11, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWarren County, OH |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 11, 2020 | Docket Event | THERE IS ANOTHER COA CASE 2020-02-010 WITH CHRISTOPHER M RUSSELL ON HIS 19CV92720 CASE | |
November 08, 2019 | Docket Event | FILED IN COA BOX # 241 | |
August 26, 2019 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL CASE NUMBER 17CV90106 SEPARATED FROM 2017-12-176 AND 2019-06-057 | |
June 05, 2019 | Docket Event | THERE IS ANOTHER COA CASE 2019-06-057 | |
January 04, 2019 | Docket Event | CLERK'S COMMENT - SEPARATED 2017-12-176 FROM 17CV090106 | |
December 06, 2018 | Docket Event | MAILED FILING ON 12-7-18 C/OC OA 12TH APPELLATE DISTRICT 1001 REINARTZ BLVD MIDDLETOWN OH 45042 | |
December 06, 2018 | Docket Event | MAILED COPY OF THE FILING ON 12-7-18 C/O INA AVALON 150 E GAY ST 16TH FLOOR COLUMBUS OH 43215 | |
December 06, 2018 | Docket Event | ENTRY FILED BY THE SUPREME COURT OF OHIO - DECLINES (JOURNAL BOOK 1120 PAGE 28) | |
December 06, 2018 | Docket Event | MAILED COPY OF THE FILING ON 12-7-18 C/O CHRISTOPHER RUSSELL #A646718 PO BOX 1812 MARION OH 43301 | |
December 06, 2018 | Docket Event | LABELS ONLY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.