Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Parker, James, filed a(n) Notice Of Appeal case represented by Carpenter, Carrie A., against Swisher, Alicia, in the jurisdiction of Warren County, OH, . Warren County, OH Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2014 |
CategoryNotice Of Appeal |
Last RefreshedJuly 18, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationWarren County, OH |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 03, 2015 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL CASE NUMBER 2013CVG00593 SEPARATED 1 PACKET OF ORIGINALS AND 1 BLACK BINDER WITH DVD ATTACHED SENT BACK TO COUNTY COURT | |
August 06, 2015 | Docket Event | AGREED JUDGMENT ENTRY OF DISMISSAL BY MEDIATION JRNL:AUG PG:2015 | |
August 06, 2015 | Docket Event | LABELS ONLY CARPENTER,CARRIE A LIMOLI,JOHN K WARREN COUNTY COURT | |
July 09, 2015 | Docket Event | ENTRY GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE APPELLANT'S BRIEF | |
July 09, 2015 | Docket Event | LABELS ONLY CARPENTER,CARRIE A LIMOLI,JOHN K WARREN COUNTY COURT | |
June 25, 2015 | Docket Event | ENTRY GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE APPELLANT'S BRIEF | |
June 25, 2015 | Docket Event | LABELS ONLY CARPENTER,CARRIE A LIMOLI,JOHN K WARREN COUNTY COURT | |
June 01, 2015 | Docket Event | ENTRY GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE APPELLANT'S BRIEF | |
May 14, 2015 | Docket Event | ENTRY GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE APPELLANT'S BRIEF | |
May 14, 2015 | Docket Event | LABELS ONLY CARPENTER,CARRIE A LIMOLI,JOHN K WARREN COUNTY COURT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.