Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Roldan, Gina, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Walls, Melanie B., against Roldan, Ramiro, in the jurisdiction of Warren County, OH, . Warren County, OH Superior Courts with KIRBY, JEFFREY T. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKIRBY, JEFFREY T. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 26, 2017 |
CategoryMarr Term No Child |
Last RefreshedJuly 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWarren County, OH |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 17, 2021 | Docket Event | AGREED ENTRY MARITAL REAL ESTATE | |
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event | FINAL NON CONTESTED SET FOR 07/17/2018 AT 10:15 AM IN HRA/ , HEARD BY: KIRBY, JEFFREY T. | |
July 19, 2018 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF COSTS | |
July 17, 2018 | Docket Event | FINAL APPEALABLE ORDER NOTICE MAILED TO ATTYS OR PARTIES | |
July 17, 2018 | Docket Event | DECREE OF DIVORCE (SEPARATION AGREEMENT ATTACHED) (WIFE'S FORMER NAME RESTORED) (JOURNAL BOOK 1098 PAGE 788) | |
July 02, 2018 | Docket Event | TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 07/17/2018 AT 10:30 AM IN HRA/ , HEARD BY: KIRBY, JEFFREY T. DATE IN THE MOTION TO BE FILED BY ATTORNEY D. ERNST. | |
June 06, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE MAILED TO | |
April 18, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE MAILED TO | |
March 20, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE MAILED TO | |
March 20, 2018 | Docket Event | SCHEDULING CONFERENCE SET FOR 04/18/2018 AT 11:15 AM IN HRA/ , HEARD BY: KIRBY, JEFFREY T. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.