Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Cape, Jaclyn Gerzema, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Schiavone Iv, Frank J., against Cape, Fredrick T., in the jurisdiction of Warren County, OH, . Warren County, OH Superior Courts with KIRBY, JEFFREY T. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKIRBY, JEFFREY T. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 18, 2017 |
CategoryMarr. Term With Chil |
Last RefreshedJuly 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWarren County, OH |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 19, 2018 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF COSTS | |
July 06, 2018 | Docket Event | SHARED PARENTING PLAN (JOURNAL BOOK 1097 PAGE 349) | |
July 06, 2018 | Docket Event | SHARED PARENTING DECREE FILED (JOURNAL BOOK 1097 PAGE 346) | |
July 06, 2018 | Docket Event | DECREE OF DIVORCE (JOURNAL BOOK 1097 PAGE 382) | |
July 06, 2018 | Docket Event | FINAL APPEALABLE ORDER NOTICE MAILED TO ATTYS OR PARTIES | |
July 06, 2018 | Docket Event | ENTRY SUSPENDING PARENTING TIME (JOURNAL BOOK 1097 PAGE 511) | |
July 06, 2018 | Docket Event | SEPARATION AGREEMENT FILED (JOURNAL BOOK 1097 PAGE 374) | |
June 19, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE MAILED TO | |
June 19, 2018 | Docket Event | ENTRY OR DISMISS SET FOR 07/09/2018 AT 1:00 PM IN HRA/ , HEARD BY: KIRBY, JEFFREY T. | |
April 18, 2018 | Docket Event | FINAL NON CONTESTED SET FOR 04/18/2018 AT 1:30 PM WITH JUDGE KIRBY. CONTINUED FROM 3/12/18 AT THE REQUEST OF ATTORNEY F. SCHIAVONE. TIME CHANDGED FROM 11:30 A.M. AT THE REQUEST OF ATTORNEY F. SCHIAVONE. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.