Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Lakeview Loan Servicing Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Gilliam, Christopher S., Sterling Chase Homeowners' Association, Wright, Barney, in the jurisdiction of Warren County, OH, . Warren County, OH Superior Courts with ODA II, DONALD E. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeODA II, DONALD E. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2017 |
CategoryForeclosures |
Last RefreshedNovember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWarren County, OH |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 01, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (JOURNAL BOOK 1352 PAGE 712) | |
September 01, 2023 | Docket Event | REOPENED CASE CLOSED | |
March 27, 2018 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF COSTS | |
March 21, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY (JOURNAL BOOK 1083 PAGE 541) **COPY TO BK** | |
February 26, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY STATUS | |
February 26, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT | |
February 26, 2018 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND PROPOSED ENTRY | |
February 26, 2018 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDICIAL REPORT | |
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event | SUMMONS SUCCESSFUL SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL ISSUED 1/23/18 TO: STERLING CHASE HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION C/O AMY SCHOTT FERGUSON S/A :CM ? BY TRACY C CRAFT | |
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event | SUMMONS UNSUCCESSFUL SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL ISSUED 12/28/17 TO: GILLIAM, CHRISTOPHER S.UNKN SPOUSE IF ANY OF CHRISTOPHER S GILLIAM :CM RETURNED 1/24/18 UNCLAIMED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.