Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Capital One N.A., filed a(n) Other Civil case represented by Keck, Jill A., against Masters, Ruthanne, in the jurisdiction of Warren County, OH, . Warren County, OH Superior Courts with TEPE, TIMOTHY N. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTEPE, TIMOTHY N. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 26, 2017 |
CategoryOther Civil |
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWarren County, OH |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 31, 2019 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF COSTS | |
September 17, 2018 | Docket Event | FINAL APPEALABLE ORDER NOTICE MAILED TO ATTYS OR PARTIES | |
September 17, 2018 | Docket Event | LABELS ONLY | |
September 17, 2018 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ENTRY FILED (JOURNAL BOOK 1107 PAGE 388) | |
September 04, 2018 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
September 04, 2018 | Docket Event | NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT | |
August 22, 2018 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL ORDER SENT TO ATTORNEY | |
March 05, 2018 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED. REASON: | |
March 05, 2018 | Docket Event | SUMMONS SENT TO BE SERVED BY ORDINARY MAIL ISSUED TO: MASTERS, RUTHANNE | |
March 05, 2018 | Docket Event | LABELS ONLY - OM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.