Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bayview Loan Servicing Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Doyle, Stephen T., against Henson, Ralph P., Castle Bail Bonds Inc., Bankers Insurance Company, Doe, Jane, Henson, Raymond P., (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Warren County, OH, . Warren County, OH Superior Courts with TEPE, TIMOTHY N. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTEPE, TIMOTHY N. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 28, 2017 |
CategoryForeclosures |
Last RefreshedJuly 17, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWarren County, OH |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 21, 2018 | Docket Event | LABELS ONLY | |
March 21, 2018 | Docket Event | ENTRY CORRECTING DISTRIBUTION (COPY TO WCSO) (JOURNAL BOOK 1083 PAGE 469) | |
January 22, 2018 | Docket Event | JOURNAL ENTRY CONFIRMING SALE ORDERING DEED & DIST. (COPY TO WCSO) (JOURNAL BOOK 1075 PAGE 317) | |
January 22, 2018 | Docket Event | FINAL APPEALABLE ORDER NOTICE MAILED TO ATTYS OR PARTIES | |
January 22, 2018 | Docket Event | LABELS ONLY | |
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event | ASSIGNMENT OF BID | |
December 26, 2017 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF COSTS | |
December 18, 2017 | Docket Event | AUCTIONEER PAYMENT REQUEST | |
December 18, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER OF SALE RETD & FILED SHERIFF WARREN CO (PROPERTY PURCHASED BY FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION) | |
December 18, 2017 | Docket Event | SHERIFF SALE PURCHASER INFORMATION FORM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.