Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Young, Joshua A, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Stephenson, Courtney M, in the jurisdiction of Warren County, OH, . Warren County, OH Superior Courts with OLIVER, TIM presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2015 |
CategoryMarr Term No Child |
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWarren County, OH |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 12, 2016 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $140.47 RECEIPT #287687 | |
August 12, 2016 | Docket Event | FAMILY VIOLENCE ASSESSED $5.33 | |
August 12, 2016 | Docket Event | GENERAL CLERK LEGAL ASSESSED $135.14 | |
April 13, 2016 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ENTRY AND DECREE OF DIVORCE STATUS: DF JRNL:APR PG:2016 JRNL:APR PG:2016 | |
April 13, 2016 | Docket Event | FINAL APPEALABLE ORDER NOTICE MAILED TO ATTYS OR PARTIES YOUNG,JOSHUA A STEPHENSON,COURTNEY M | |
March 09, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE SCHEDULED SENT YOUNG,JOSHUA A STEPHENSON,COURTNEY M | |
February 08, 2016 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURNED-COMPLETED (SVC ISSUED 1/25/16) COURTNEY COURTNEY M STEPHENSON:CM 2/5/2016 BY ? | |
January 25, 2016 | Docket Event | SUMMONS & COPIES MAILED TO DEFENDANT CM STEPHENSON,COURTNEY M | |
January 25, 2016 | Docket Event | PRECIPE FILED | |
January 20, 2016 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURNED-NOT COMPLETED (SVC ISSUED 12/28/15) COURTNEY COURTNEY M STEPHENSON:CM RETURNED 1/20/2016 1/20/2016 UNABLE TO FORWARD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.