Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Harris, John, filed a(n) Other Civil case represented by Duwel, David M., against Mason Area Chamber Inc, in the jurisdiction of Warren County, OH, . Warren County, OH Superior Courts with ODA II, DONALD E. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2015 |
CategoryOther Civil |
Last RefreshedJuly 17, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationWarren County, OH |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 31, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (JOURNAL BOOK 1003 PAGE 190) | |
May 06, 2016 | Docket Event | AGREED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT MASON AREA CHAMBER, INC FDBA NORTHEAST CINCINNATI CHAMBER AND NDBA MASON-DEERFIELD CHAMBER AN ADDITIONAL 28 DAYS TO MOVE, PLEAD OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT OF JOHN HARRIS AND CONTINUING THE MAY 12, 2016 HEARING (JOURNAL BOOK 1003 PAGE 186) | |
May 06, 2016 | Docket Event | JUDGE ODA II, DONALD E: ASSIGNED | |
May 06, 2016 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 06/02/2016 AT 10:00 AM IN 4/ , HEARD BY: ODA II, DONALD E | |
April 07, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE SCHEDULED SENT DUWEL,DAVID M JONES,SCOTT K CAMPBELL,J TIMOTHY | |
March 22, 2016 | Docket Event | AGREED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT MASON AREA CHAMBER INC FDBA NORTHEAST CINCINNATI CHAMBER AND NDBA MASON-DEERFIELD CHAMBER AN ADDITIONAL 29 DAYS TO MOVE PLEAD OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT OF JOHN HARRIS | |
March 11, 2016 | Docket Event | AGREED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT MASON AREA CHAMBER INC FDBA NORTHEAST CINCINNATI CHAMBER AND NDBA MASON DEERFIELD CHAMBER AN ADDITIONAL 30 DAYS TO MOVE, PLEAD OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT OF JOHN HARRIS | |
February 26, 2016 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT | |
February 17, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS: HS DUWEL,DAVID M JONES,SCOTT K | |
February 01, 2016 | Docket Event | EX PARTE ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT MASON AREA CHAMBER INC FDBA NORTHEAST CINCINNATI CHAMBER AND NDBA MASON-DEERFIELD CHAMBER 30 DAYS TO MOVE PLEAD OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT OF JOHN HARRIS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.