Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Grooms, Joanna M., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Davis, Michael J., against Grooms, Aric B., in the jurisdiction of Warren County, OH, . Warren County, OH Superior Courts with KIRBY, JEFFREY T. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKIRBY, JEFFREY T. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 09, 2014 |
CategoryMarr. Term With Chil |
Last RefreshedJuly 17, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWarren County, OH |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event | AGREED ENTRY MODIFYING CHILD SUPPORT/HEALTH CARE ORDER | |
December 04, 2020 | Docket Event | ENTRY ORDERING PAYMENT OF CASH MEDICAL SUPPORT | |
May 07, 2020 | Docket Event | QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER (JOURNAL BOOK 1187 PAGE 891) | |
December 10, 2019 | Docket Event | QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER (JOURNAL BOOK 1170 PAGE 584) THE SALVATION ARMY EMPLOYEE PENSION PLAN & TRUST AGREEMENT | |
July 11, 2018 | Docket Event | ENTRY FILED (JOURNAL BOOK 1098 PAGE 21) | |
June 06, 2018 | Docket Event | JUDGE KIRBY, JEFFREY T.: ASSIGNED | |
June 04, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CSEA ADMINISTRATIVE RECOMMENDATION REGARDING TERMINATION OF SUPPORT | |
January 04, 2016 | Docket Event | ENTRY TERMINATING AN ARREARS ORDER JRNL:JAN PG:2016 | |
December 02, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO COURT OF CSEA'S INVESTIGATION FINDINGS | |
December 02, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO OBLIGOR OF INCOME WITHHOLDING PROCESS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.