Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Hobbs, Ryan Daniel, filed a(n) Professional Tort case against Mulligan, Patrick, Katchmer, George, Patrick Mulligan & Associates, in the jurisdiction of Warren County, OH, . Warren County, OH Superior Courts with PEELER, ROBERT W. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2014 |
CategoryProfessional Tort |
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWarren County, OH |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 26, 2018 | Docket Event | DESTRUCTION OF DEPOSITIONS | |
October 25, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO RETRIEVE DEPOSITION | |
January 05, 2016 | Docket Event | CHANGE OF ADDRESS | |
May 22, 2015 | Docket Event | FINAL APPEALABLE ORDER NOTICE MAILED TO ATTYS OR PARTIES HOBBS,RYAN DANIEL PATRICK MULLIGAN & ASSOCIATES KATCHMER,GEORGE | |
May 22, 2015 | Docket Event | DECISION AND ENTRY GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS CONVERTED TO JRNL:MAY PG:2015 A MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
May 21, 2015 | Docket Event | DEFENDATNS' MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTIN TO STRIKE | |
May 11, 2015 | Docket Event | MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS REPLY MEMORANDUM TO DISMISS UNDER LOC.R.3.05(F)(4) | |
May 06, 2015 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS' REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS | |
May 01, 2015 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURNED-NOT COMPLETED (SVC ISSUED 3/20/15) CERTIFIED MAIL RET'D - UNCLAIMED - GEORGE KATCHMER,KATCHMER LAW OFFICE | |
May 01, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FAILURE OF SERV MAILED TO ATTY RYAN HOBBS PRO SE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.