Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Third Federal Savings And Loan Assoc., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Casterline, C. Scott, against Jackson, Anne, Jackson, Scott, in the jurisdiction of Summit County, OH, . Summit County, OH Superior Courts with CHRISTINE CROCE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 23, 2017 |
CategoryForeclosure |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSummit County, OH |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT
Date: February 23, 2017PRECIPE FOR ALIAS ORDER OF SALE.
Date: May 11, 2018PRECIPE FOR ORDER OF SALE.
Date: October 27, 2017NOTICE ISSUED TOMAN, BRADLEY P
Date: September 24, 2018NOTICE ISSUED CASTERLINE, C. SCOTT
Date: September 24, 2018NOTICE ISSUED JACKSON, ANNE M.
Date: September 24, 2018MOTION TO CANCEL SHERIFF'S SALE
Date: December 15, 2017NOTICE ISSUED JACKSON, SCOTT C.
Date: September 24, 2018MOTION TO CANCEL SHERIFF'S SALE
Date: June 08, 2018NOTICE ISSUED TOMAN, BRADLEY P
Date: October 11, 2017NOTICE ISSUED JACKSON, SCOTT C.
Date: October 11, 2017ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAW OF SHERIFF'S SALE SCHEDULED FOR JULY 13, 2018. CC
Date: June 11, 2018NOTICE ISSUED - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING JACKSON, SCOTT C.
Date: April 28, 20172017-1633 ORDER OF SALE ISSUED TO SUMMIT COUNTY SHERIFF
Date: November 07, 2017NOTICE ISSUED JACKSON, ANNE M.
Date: October 11, 2017FINAL JUDICIAL REPORT
Date: April 11, 2017PROOF OF PUBLICATION. COSTS OF $790.00
Date: December 14, 2017NOTICE OF SHERIFF SALE
Date: December 05, 2017PROOF OF PUBLICATION. CANCELLED AFTER 1 RUN
Date: June 20, 2018ORDER CANCELLING SHERIFF'S SALE. C CROCE
Date: December 27, 2017MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: April 11, 2017SUMMONS ISSUED BY CERTIFIED MAIL JACKSON, ANNE M.
Date: February 24, 2017SHERIFF'S DEED APPROVED LEGAL
Date: March 29, 2017DECREE OF FORECLOSURE. CC
Date: October 11, 2017FINAL JUDICIAL REPORT
Date: September 29, 2017NOTICE ISSUED CASTERLINE, C. SCOTT
Date: October 11, 2017SUMMONS ISSUED BY CERTIFIED MAIL JACKSON, SCOTT C.
Date: February 24, 2017LAND APPRAISAL/PROPERTY APPRAISED AT $153,000.00.
Date: November 20, 2017NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF AFFIDAVITS
Date: September 29, 2017AFFIDAVIT
Date: May 16, 2017INSTRUCTIONS TO CLERK FOR SERVICE
Date: February 23, 2017NOTICE OF FILING OF AFFIDAVIT OF STATUS OF ACCOUNT
Date: September 29, 2017AFFIDAVIT
Date: May 04, 2017NOTICE ISSUED JACKSON, ANNE M.
Date: May 10, 2017MILITARY AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 29, 2017MILITARY AFFIDAVIT
Date: April 11, 2017MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: September 29, 2017SUMMONS ISSUED TO SUMMIT COUNTY SHERIFF. JACKSON, ANNE M.
Date: February 24, 2017SUMMONS ISSUED TO SUMMIT COUNTY SHERIFF. JACKSON, SCOTT C.
Date: February 24, 2017CERTIFICATE OF READINESS.
Date: February 23, 2017COURT DENIES PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT. C CROCE
Date: May 10, 2017NOTICE ISSUED JACKSON, SCOTT C.
Date: May 10, 2017NOTICE ISSUED CASTERLINE, C. SCOTT
Date: May 10, 2017NOTICE ISSUED - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING JACKSON, ANNE M.
Date: April 28, 2017NOTICE ISSUED TOMAN, BRADLEY P
Date: May 10, 2017PRELIMINARY JUDICIAL REPORT.
Date: February 23, 2017SUPPLEMENTAL PRELIMINARY JUDICIAL REPORT
Date: February 23, 2017MOTION TO STAY CASE
Date: May 17, 2017ENTRY GRANTING MOTION TO STAY. C CROCE
Date: May 23, 2017MOTION FOR ADDITIONAL TIME
Date: August 09, 2017MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: September 20, 20182018-0544 ALIAS ORDER OF SALE ISSUED TO SCSO.
Date: May 21, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 06, 2018 | Docket Event | **ORIGINAL ACTION COST PAID IN FULL. JL | |
October 24, 2018 | Docket Event | **CASE COSTED THRU 9/25/18 FOR ORIGINAL COSTS. APPLIED PLTF DEPOSIT. BILLED PLTF ATTY CASTERLINE $1,003.32. JL | |
September 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Regular Mail Service - Mailed SCOTT C. JACKSON | |
September 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Regular Mail Service - Mailed C. SCOTT CASTERLINE | |
September 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Regular Mail Service - Mailed BRADLEY P TOMAN | |
September 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Regular Mail Service - Mailed ANNE M. JACKSON | |
September 24, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE ISSUED TOMAN, BRADLEY P | |
September 24, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE ISSUED CASTERLINE, C. SCOTT | |
September 24, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE ISSUED JACKSON, ANNE M. | |
September 24, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE ISSUED JACKSON, SCOTT C. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.