Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Simmons, Amanda, filed a(n) Declaratory Judgment case represented by Van Slyke, David, against Booth, Donald, Citimortgage Inc, Donald T Booth, Unk Spouse Of, represented by Blaske, Nathan, in the jurisdiction of Summit County, OH, . Summit County, OH Superior Courts with ALISON BREAUX presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2013 |
CategoryDeclaratory Judgment |
Last RefreshedJuly 13, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSummit County, OH |
|
CIVIL COMPLAINT FILED
Date: February 28, 2013F.A.O. NOTICES ISSUED BY REGULAR MAIL. VAN SLYKE, DAVID LEE
Date: May 22, 2013F.A.O. NOTICES ISSUED BY REGULAR MAIL. DONALD T BOOTH, UNK SPOUSE OF
Date: May 22, 2013F.A.O. NOTICES ISSUED BY REGULAR MAIL. BLASKE, NATHAN HUGH
Date: May 22, 2013F.A.O. NOTICES ISSUED BY REGULAR MAIL. BOOTH, DONALD T
Date: May 22, 2013NOTICE ISSUED BLASKE, NATHAN HUGH
Date: May 03, 2013F.A.O. NOTICES ISSUED BY REGULAR MAIL. BOWER, AMELIA ANN
Date: May 22, 2013NOTICE ISSUED DONALD T BOOTH, UNK SPOUSE OF
Date: May 03, 2013NOTICE ISSUED BOOTH, DONALD T
Date: May 03, 2013NOTICE ISSUED BOWER, AMELIA ANN
Date: May 03, 2013NOTICE ISSUED VAN SLYKE, DAVID LEE
Date: May 03, 2013SUMMONS ISSUED DONALD T BOOTH, UNK SPOUSE OF
Date: March 01, 2013NOTICE OF APPEARANCE NATHAN H BLASKE ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT CITIMORTGAGE INC
Date: March 29, 2013SUMMONS ISSUED CITIMORTGAGE INC
Date: March 01, 2013SUMMONS ISSUED BOOTH, DONALD T
Date: March 01, 2013INSTRUCTIONS FOR CERTIFIED MAIL SERVICE.
Date: February 28, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 03, 2018 | Docket Event | **CASE COSTED THRU 10/3/18 TO UPDATE. AA | |
July 05, 2017 | Docket Event | This Case was transferred from Judge: MCKENNEY, TODD to Judge: BREAUX, ALISON | |
December 16, 2014 | Docket Event | This Case was transferred from Judge: STORMER, ELINORE to Judge: MCKENNEY, TODD Reason: LEFT OFFICE | |
June 17, 2013 | Docket Event | Docket Entry:53 NOTICE ISSUED TO NATHAN HUGH BLASKE RETURNED MARKED NO LONGER AT THAT ADDRESS. | |
May 22, 2013 | Docket Event | F.A.O. NOTICES ISSUED BY REGULAR MAIL. VAN SLYKE, DAVID LEE | |
May 22, 2013 | Docket Event | F.A.O. NOTICES ISSUED BY REGULAR MAIL. DONALD T BOOTH, UNK SPOUSE OF | |
May 22, 2013 | Docket Event | F.A.O. NOTICES ISSUED BY REGULAR MAIL. BLASKE, NATHAN HUGH | |
May 22, 2013 | Docket Event | F.A.O. NOTICES ISSUED BY REGULAR MAIL. BOOTH, DONALD T | |
May 22, 2013 | Docket Event | F.A.O. NOTICES ISSUED BY REGULAR MAIL. BOWER, AMELIA ANN | |
May 22, 2013 | Docket Event | AGREED JUDGMENT ENTRY. THE COURT ORDERS THAT SIMMONS IS FOUND TO BE THE OWNER OF, AND IN TITLE TO THE PROPERTY. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, THAT THE RECORDS OF THE SUMMIT COUNTY AUDITOR AND SUMMIT COUNTY RECORDER MAY BE AMENDED AS NECESSARY TO REFLECT SIMMONS' OWNERSHIP OF, AND TITLE TO THE PROPERTY. THERE IS NO JUST REASON FOR DELAY. RJB FOR EMS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.