Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Cyber Island, Richard A. Bowling Llc, filed a(n) Injunction case represented by Migdal, Kirk, against Springfield Township Police Department, Summit County, Summit County Office Of Consumer Affairs, represented by Evans, Marvin, in the jurisdiction of Summit County, OH, . Summit County, OH Superior Courts with THOMAS PARKER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 10, 2010 |
CategoryInjunction |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSummit County, OH |
|
SUBPOENA TO DONALD MICHEL BY PAS.
Date: July 15, 2010NOTICE TO JOIN IN CO-PETITIONERS' MOTION FOR STAY.
Date: February 01, 2011CA 25798 PETITIONER'S-APPELLANTS NOTICE OF APPEAL.
Date: February 01, 2011PLAINTIFF, F & C MARKETING, LLC'S BRIEF REGARDING CONSTITUTIONALITY OF STATUE.
Date: July 14, 2010PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER.
Date: June 14, 2010SUBPOENA TO GEORGE GEORGEKOPOULOS BY PAS.
Date: July 15, 2010PLAINTIFFS' DOCKETING STATEMENT.
Date: February 01, 2011ORDER APPOINTING PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER. TMP
Date: June 14, 2010SUBPOENA TO JAMES GAMBLE BY PAS.
Date: July 15, 2010SUBPOENA TO RICHARD A. BOWLING BY PAS.
Date: July 15, 2010SUBPOENA TO BRIAN KENDRICK BY PAS
Date: July 15, 2010DEFENDANT'S TRIAL BRIEF.
Date: August 16, 2010PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT AUTHORITY.
Date: October 26, 2010DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT AUTHORITY.
Date: October 27, 2010DOCKETING STATEMENT.
Date: January 21, 2011DEFENDANT, COUNTY OF SUMMIT'S MOTION FOR SUPERSEDEAS BOND.
Date: February 22, 2011AMENDED COMPLAINT.
Date: July 28, 2010INSTRUCTIONS FOR PROCESS SERVER. SUBPOENA ISSUED TO PAULA PRENTICE TO PROCESS SERVER TO SERVE.
Date: September 10, 2010PLAINTIFF, F & C MARKETING LLC'S NOTICE OF DISMISSAL, WITHOUT PREJUDICE.
Date: September 01, 2010ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS TO QUASH AND FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER. TP
Date: September 03, 2010PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR STAY.
Date: January 19, 2011CA-25779 PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF APPEAL.
Date: January 19, 2011Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 24, 2011 | Docket Event | SERVICE Regular Mail Claimed | |
June 22, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE ISSUED WITH CERTIFIED COPY OF APPEAL DISMISSAL TO JUDGE PARKER BY REGULAR MAIL. | |
June 21, 2011 | Docket Event | CA-25779 APPEAL TO APPELLANTS, GOLD RUSH CYBER CAFE AND SPINNERS INTERNET CAFE IS DISMISSED. | |
April 26, 2011 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL ACTION COST PAID IN FULL. | |
April 21, 2011 | Docket Event | 2ND BILLING - P1 ATTY. | |
April 14, 2011 | Docket Event | SERVICE Regular Mail Claimed | |
April 11, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE ISSUED WITH COPY OF CERTIFIED APPEAL DISMISSAL TO JUDGE PARKER BY REGULAR MAIL. | |
April 08, 2011 | Docket Event | CA-25779 & 25798 CA 25798 IS DISMISSED. CONSOLITATION OF CA 25779 & 25798 IS TERMINATED. CA 25779 REMAINS PENDING. | |
March 24, 2011 | Docket Event | P1 - CYBER ISLAND - BILL RETURNED; NDAA | |
March 21, 2011 | Docket Event | **CASE COSTED THRU 2/22/11 - BILLED PLAINTIFF $95.16. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.