Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Graham, Nathan, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Pro Se, against Jpay Inc, represented by Emeka, Farah L, in the jurisdiction of Richland County. This case was filed in Richland County Superior Courts with DEWEESE, JUDGE JAMES presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 11, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedDecember 21, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationRichland County, OH |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 01, 3000 | Docket Event | SENT INFORMATION TO WITHOLD FROM COMMISSARY ACCOUNT (FILING DEPOSIT ONLY) | |
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event | EVENT RESULTED AS:: ORAL EVIDENTIARY HRG ON MOT FOR RELIEF FROM JDGMNT scheduled on: 11/07/2022 10:30 AM Has been: CASE DISMISSED JILL M COCHRAN, Presiding | |
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED SCANNED 10/31/2022 AMB Attorney: PRO SE | |
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event | STATEMENT SENT TO PLTF NATHAN GRAHAM FOR $24.50- COSTS DUE SCANNED 10/31/2022 AMB | |
October 27, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF ATTORNEY FARAH L. EMEKA ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT JPAY INC FILED SCANNED 10/27/2022 AMB Attorney: EMEKA, FARAH L | |
October 26, 2022 | Docket Event | POSTAGE FEE ZACHARY B SIMONOFF JPAY INC NATHAN GRAHAM | |
October 26, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ENTRY ON MOTION TO WITHDRAW FILED. ORDERED: IN THIS CASE, ATTORNEY SIMONOFF'S MOTION INDICATES THAT "COUNSEL IS NO LONGER REPRESENTNG JPAY AND THEREFORE IS REQUIRED TO WITHDRAW FROM HIS REPRESENATION PURUSNAT TO RULE OF PROFESSIONAL CONDUCT RULE 1.16". HE THEN SERVED THIS MOTION ON JPAY VIA A REDACTED EMAIL. THIS MOTION FAILS TO COMPLY WITH THE RULES. A REPRESENTATIVE FOR JPAY MUST EITHER SIGN OFF ON THE MOTION TO WITHDRAW, APPEAR AT A HEARING ON A MOTION TO WITHDRAW, OR A SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL MUST BE FILED. FOR THE REASONS, STATED ABOVE, THE MOTION OF ATTORNEY SIMONOFF IS DENIED. THE HEARING SCHEDULED ON NOVEMBER 7TH, 2022 WILL NOT BE CONTINUED. (SEE IMAGE FOR FURTHER DETAILS) SCANNED 10/26/2022 AMB | |
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY ZACHARY B. SIMONOFF'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL AND MOTION TO CONTINUE HEARING SET FOR NOVEMBER 7TH, 2022 SCANNED 10/24/2022 AMB Attorney: SIMONOFF, ZACHARY B | |
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event | POSTAGE FEE NATHAN GRAHAM ZACHARY B SIMONOFF | |
October 03, 2022 | Docket Event | HEARING SCHEDULED: Judge: COCHRAN, JILL M Event: ORAL EVIDENTIARY HRG ON MOT FOR RELIEF FROM JDGMNT Date: 11/07/2022 Time: 10:30 AM Result: CASE DISMISSED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.