Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Andrew T French filed a(n) General Appeals - Appeals case represented by Michael Hallock, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County. This case was filed in Montgomery County Superior Courts with Michael T. Hall presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 30, 2016 |
CategoryCourt Of Appeals |
Last RefreshedDecember 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaAppeals |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, OH |
Matter TypeGeneral Appeals |
RULE 11B NOTICE FILED COA - RULE 11(B) NOTICE Sent on: 06/22/2016 14:03:48.09
Date: June 22, 2016MOTION OF APPELLANT FOR ACCELERATED CALENDAR FILED Attorney: HALLOCK, MICHAEL (0084630)
Date: August 19, 2016CRIMINAL DOCKET STATEMENT FILED- TR TO BE FILED
Date: June 01, 2016NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FILED ATTORNEY: JANS, HEATHER N (0084470)
Date: September 07, 2016BRIEF OF APPELLANT FILED Attorney: HALLOCK, MICHAEL (0084630)
Date: August 19, 2016CRIMINAL SUMMARY OF DOCKET FILED
Date: June 01, 2016FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE/AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY FILED
Date: July 28, 2016DEC & ENTRY FILED REMOVING VICTOR HODGE AS ATTORNEY FOR APPELLANT
Date: June 30, 2016NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED
Date: May 31, 2016CERTIFICATE OF MAILING 06/22/16
Date: July 05, 2016MAGISTRATES ORDER FILED CASE WILL BE SET FOR ORAL ARGUMENT
Date: October 13, 2016MOTION OF APPELLANT TO DISMISS FILED Attorney: HALLOCK, MICHAEL (0084630)
Date: October 25, 2016AMENDED MOTION TO DISMISS FILED Attorney: HALLOCK, MICHAEL (0084630)
Date: November 02, 2016RECEIPT FILED FROM THE PROSECUTORS OFFICE - 06/22/16
Date: June 27, 2016APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL FILED APPOINTING MICHAEL HALLOCK AS COUNSEL ON APPEAL
Date: July 28, 2016BRIEF OF APPELLEE AND REQUEST FOR ORAL ARGUMENT FILED Attorney: JANS, HEATHER N (0084470E)
Date: October 06, 2016DEC & FINAL JUDGMENT ENTRY DISMISSING APPEAL
Date: November 16, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 07, 2017 | Docket Event | COST STATEMENT SENT: CASSEL, ANNA A was sent bill for $104.00. Printed on 06/07/2017 15:51:27.05. | |
April 25, 2017 | Docket Event | COST STATEMENT SENT: CASSEL, ANNA A was sent bill for $104.00. Printed on 04/25/2017 11:55:45.92. | |
March 07, 2017 | Docket Event | THE RECORD (SUMARY OF DOCKET & TRANSCRIPT, IF FILED) IS BEING KEPT WITH THE COURT OF APPEALS CASE. | |
February 01, 2017 | Docket Event | COST STATEMENT SENT: CASSEL, ANNA A was sent bill for $104.00. Printed on 02/01/2017 11:39:14.13. | |
January 26, 2017 | Docket Event | COST STATEMENT SENT: CASSEL, ANNA A was sent bill for $104.00. Printed on 01/26/2017 15:40:53.48. | |
November 17, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE PURSUANT TO APPELLATE RULE 30A SENT TO ALL PARTIES BY REGULAR MAIL COA - RULE 30A NOTICE Sent on: 11/17/2016 10:25:01.41 | |
November 16, 2016 | Docket Event | DEC & FINAL JUDGMENT ENTRY DISMISSING APPEAL | |
November 02, 2016 | Docket Event | AMENDED MOTION TO DISMISS FILED Attorney: HALLOCK, MICHAEL (0084630) | |
October 27, 2016 | Docket Event | SHOW CAUSE ORDER FILED APPELLANT SHALL SHOW CAUSE, IN WRITING, WITHIN 14 DAYS FROM THIS ORDER WHY THIS APPEAL SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, PURSUANT TO APP R 28 | |
October 25, 2016 | Docket Event | MOTION OF APPELLANT TO DISMISS FILED Attorney: HALLOCK, MICHAEL (0084630) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.