Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
3 Ecj Llc, Josh Johnston, filed a(n) Jandj Lighting Llc case represented by Daniel J Donnellon, against James Koller, Jandj Lighting Columbus Llc, Jandj Lighting Llc, represented by Glen R Mcmurry, Susan D Solle, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County. This case was filed in Montgomery County Superior Courts with Susan D. Solle presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 08, 2018 |
CategoryJandj Lighting Llc |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMontgomery County, OH |
|
NOTICE: OF FILING EXHIBIT A TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT FILED BY DANIEL DONNELLON
Date: August 13, 2018CASE INFORMATION SHEET FILED BY DANIEL DONNELLON
Date: August 08, 2018INSTRUCTIONS FOR SERVICE ON A NEW CASE VIA PROCESS SERVER FILED BY DANIEL DONNELLON
Date: August 08, 2018MOTION: APPOINT PROCESS SERVER FILED BY DANIEL DONNELLON
Date: August 08, 2018AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH VERIFICATION PAGE FILED BY DANIEL DONNELLON
Date: August 08, 2018MOTION: TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER FILED BY DANIEL DONNELLON
Date: August 08, 2018CERTIFICATION OF COUNSEL IN SUPPORT OF RELIEF FILED BY DANIEL DONNELLON
Date: August 08, 2018MOTION: FOR EXPEDITED DISCOVERY FILED BY DANIEL DONNELLON
Date: August 08, 2018ORDER: FOR EXPEDITED DISCOVERY Receipt: 1227996 Date: 10/26/2018
Date: August 08, 2018CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED CIVIL SUMMONS EFILING Sent on: 08/08/2018 14:55:18.02
Date: August 08, 2018CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED CIVIL SUMMONS EFILING Sent on: 08/08/2018 16:20:28.73
Date: August 08, 2018ORDER: APPOINT PROCESS SERVER Receipt: 1227996 Date: 10/26/2018
Date: August 08, 2018INSTRUCTIONS FOR SERVICE OF DOCUMENTS BY PROCESS SERVER FILED BY DANIEL DONNELLON
Date: August 08, 2018MOTION: EMERGENCY MOTION TO DISSOLVE TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER FILED BY SUSAN SOLLE
Date: August 09, 2018ORDER: AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL Receipt: 1227996 Date: 10/26/2018
Date: October 26, 2018ORDER: DISMISS - CASE SETTLED Receipt: 1227996 Date: 10/26/2018
Date: August 28, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 26, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER: AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL Receipt: 1227996 Date: 10/26/2018 | |
October 26, 2018 | Docket Event | CIVIL REFUND DANIEL J DONNELLON $9.00 | |
August 28, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER: DISMISS - CASE SETTLED Receipt: 1227996 Date: 10/26/2018 | |
August 16, 2018 | Docket Event | SUCCESSFUL SERVICE Method : CIVIL PERSONAL SERVICE PROCESS SERVER Issued : 08/08/2018 Service : CIVIL INITIAL SERVICE EFILING Served : 08/09/2018 Return : 08/16/2018 On : JANDJ LIGHTING LLC Signed By : JO AUSTIN Reason : CIVIL SUCCESSFUL SERVICE Comment : Tracking #: CVPRS00000000109936 | |
August 16, 2018 | Docket Event | SUCCESSFUL SERVICE Method : CIVIL PERSONAL SERVICE PROCESS SERVER Issued : 08/08/2018 Service : CIVIL INITIAL SERVICE EFILING Served : 08/09/2018 Return : 08/16/2018 On : JANDJ LIGHTING COLUMBUS LLC Signed By : TINA RASNIC Reason : CIVIL SUCCESSFUL SERVICE Comment : Tracking #: CVPRS00000000109937 | |
August 14, 2018 | Docket Event | SERVICE OF SUMMONS RETURN PROCESS SERVER RETURN OF SERVICE TO STATUTORY AGENT FILED BY DANIEL DONNELLON | |
August 14, 2018 | Docket Event | SERVICE OF SUMMONS RETURN PROCESS SERVER RETURN OF SERVICE TO JANDJ LIGHTING LLC FILED BY DANIEL DONNELLON | |
August 14, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE PRETRIAL SCHEDULINGCONFERENCE ON AUGUST 27, 2018 AT 2:00 PM Receipt: 1227996 Date: 10/26/2018 | |
August 13, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE: OF FILING EXHIBIT A TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT FILED BY DANIEL DONNELLON | |
August 13, 2018 | Docket Event | REPLY PLAINTIFFS' MEMO IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISSOLVE TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER FILED BY DANIEL DONNELLON |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.