Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
MICHAEL DUREIKO vs PATRICIA A. OSMUN
On September 23, 2014 a civil all other case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County. Judge David D. Brannon presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 23, 2014
Last Refreshed
December 12, 2023
Filing Location
Montgomery County, OH
Category
PATRICIA A OSMUN TRUSTEE
Practice Area
Probate
Matter Type
Trusts
Status
Dismissal
Overview
Causes of Action
1. Accounting of Trust
2. Breach of Fiduciary Duties
3. Tortious Interference with Inheritance Rights against Defendant individually
CLAIM FOR RELIEF Punitive Damages
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT OF DEFENDANT FILED BY MARYBETH RUTLEDGE
Date: Mar 09, 2015RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DISMISS BY PLAINTIFF FILED BY DAVID BRANNON
Date: Nov 26, 2014CASE INFORMATION SHEET FILED BY DAVID BRANNON
Date: Sep 23, 2014INSTRUCTIONS FOR SERVICE ON A NEW CASE REGULAR MAIL FILED BY DAVID BRANNON
Date: Sep 23, 2014CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED CIVIL SUMMONS EFILING Sent on: 09/23/2014 16:31:15.39
Date: Sep 23, 2014Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 03, 2015 | Docket Event | COST STATEMENT SENT: DUREIKO, MICHAEL was sent bill for $. Printed on 06/03/2015 10:10:25.52. | |
June 03, 2015 | Docket Event | CIVIL REFUND DAVID D BRANNON $68.50 | |
June 03, 2015 | Docket Event | COST STATEMENT SENT: OSMUN INDIVIDUAL, PATRICIA A. was sent bill for $16.50. Printed on 06/03/2015 10:17:16.40. | |
June 02, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE: DISMISSAL ENTRY WITH PREJUDICE (STIPULATED) FILED BY David Brannon Receipt: 1049323 Date: 06/03/2015 Receipt: 1050005 Date: 06/08/2015 | |
March 24, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE FINAL PRETRIAL 6-30-15 BENCH TRIAL 7-24-15 Receipt: 1049323 Date: 06/03/2015 | |
March 09, 2015 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO COMPLAINT OF DEFENDANT FILED BY MARYBETH RUTLEDGE | |
February 25, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE TELEPHONE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ON 3/12/15 AT 8:50 AM Receipt: 1049323 Date: 06/03/2015 | |
February 25, 2015 | Docket Event | DECISION OVERRULING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS Receipt: 1049323 Date: 06/03/2015 | |
December 03, 2014 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION BY DEFENDANTS FILED BY MARYBETH RUTLEDGE | |
November 26, 2014 | Docket Event | RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DISMISS BY PLAINTIFF FILED BY David Brannon | |
November 21, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE MOTION TO DISMISS RESPONSE DUE 12/4/14; REPLY DUE 12/11/14 Receipt: 1050005 Date: 06/08/2015 | |
November 20, 2014 | Docket Event | MOTION: DISMISS COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION FILED BY MARYBETH RUTLEDGE | |
October 22, 2014 | Docket Event | AGREED ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE FOR CONTINUANCE OF ANSWER DATE Receipt: 1050005 Date: 06/08/2015 | |
September 24, 2014 | Docket Event | REGULAR MAIL DELIVERED TO POST OFFICE Method : CIVIL REGULAR MAIL Issued : 09/23/2014 Service : REISSUE CIVIL INITIAL SERVICE EFILING Served : 09/24/2014 Return : 09/24/2014 On : OSMUN INDIVIDUAL, PATRICIA A. Signed By : Reason : CIVIL REGULAR MAIL DELIVERED TO POST OFFICE Comment : Tracking #: CVR0000000000072020 | |
September 23, 2014 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT Receipt: 1002153 Date: 09/23/2014 FOR DAMAGES FILED BY David Brannon | |
September 23, 2014 | Docket Event | CASE INFORMATION SHEET FILED BY David Brannon | |
September 23, 2014 | Docket Event | INSTRUCTIONS FOR SERVICE ON A NEW CASE REGULAR MAIL FILED BY David Brannon | |
September 23, 2014 | Docket Event | CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED CIVIL SUMMONS EFILING Sent on: 09/23/2014 16:31:15.39 | |
September 23, 2014 | Docket Event | CIVIL DEPOSIT Receipt: 1002153 Date: 09/23/2014 | |
September 23, 2014 | Docket Event | CONVENIENCE FEE Receipt: 1002153 Date: 09/23/2014 | |
September 23, 2014 | Docket Event | Issue Date: 09/23/2014 Service: REISSUE CIVIL INITIAL SERVICE EFILING Method: CIVIL REGULAR MAIL Cost Per: $4.00 OSMUN INDIVIDUAL, PATRICIA A. 315 HART STREET SAINT JOE, IN 46785-9782 Tracking No: CVR0000000000072020 Receipt: 1049323 Date: 06/03/2015 |