Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Stanislaus Co Public Guardian filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Begen, Loretta Murphy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 08, 1996 |
CategoryConservatorship: Person |
Last RefreshedFebruary 26, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 03, 2011 | Docket Event | Imaged File | |
October 22, 2009 | Docket Event | Order Granted | |
August 07, 2009 | Docket Event | Order Granted | |
January 08, 1996 | Docket Event | Accounting Hearing | |
December 18, 1991 | Docket Event | Stat Closure: PR Permanent Letters Issued | |
November 04, 1991 | Docket Event | Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.