Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
State Of Ohio Ex Rel. City Of Trotwood Ohio, filed a(n) Gwendolyn Ballard case represented by Stephen M Mchugh, against Bayview Financial L.P., Gwendolyn Ballard, Montgomery County Auditor, Montgomery County Treasurer, Sylvester Ballard, (total of 6) See All represented by John D Clunk, Michele Phipps, No Attorney On File, Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County. This case was filed in Montgomery County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 09, 2012 |
CategoryGwendolyn Ballard |
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMontgomery County, OH |
|
CIVIL SUMMONS PREPARED AND PRINTED CIVIL SUMMONS EFILING Sent on: 08/10/2012 10:06:12.74
Date: August 10, 2012ANSWER FILED BY PRO SE PARTY DEFENDANT SYLVESTER BALLARD TO COMPLAINT
Date: September 13, 2012INSTRUCTIONS FOR SERVICE ON A NEW CASE INSTRUCTIONS FOR SERVICE FILED BY STEPHEN MCHUGH
Date: August 09, 2012CASE INFORMATION SHEET FILED BY STEPHEN MCHUGH
Date: August 09, 2012RESPONSE TO COURT NOTICE RESPONSE TO COURT NOTICE FILED BY STEPHEN MCHUGH
Date: October 01, 2012ANSWER TO COMPLAINT . FILED BY Douglas Trout
Date: September 12, 2012MOTION: LEAVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE ANSWER FILED BY John Clunk
Date: November 09, 2012ORDER: ORDER Receipt: 895136 Date: 11/30/2012
Date: November 19, 2012Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 30, 2012 | Docket Event | CIVIL REFUND STEPHEN MCHUGH $5.00 | |
November 27, 2012 | Docket Event | AGREED ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE AGREED JUDGMENT ENTRY ON SETTLEMENT Receipt: 895136 Date: 11/30/2012 | |
November 21, 2012 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO COMPLAINT DEFENDANT BAYVIEW FINANCIAL, L.P?S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT TO ABATE NUISANCE, FOR INJUNCTION AGAINST NUISANCE AND FOR DAMAGES FILED BY John Clunk | |
November 19, 2012 | Docket Event | ORDER: ORDER Receipt: 895136 Date: 11/30/2012 | |
November 09, 2012 | Docket Event | MOTION: LEAVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE ANSWER FILED BY John Clunk | |
October 01, 2012 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO COURT NOTICE RESPONSE TO COURT NOTICE FILED BY STEPHEN MCHUGH | |
September 20, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS ON GWENDOLYN BALLARD AND BAYVIEW FINANCIAL, L.P. Receipt: 895136 Date: 11/30/2012 | |
September 14, 2012 | Docket Event | SERVICE FAILURE NOTIFICATION MAILED FAILURE OF SERVICE NOTIFICATION REQUESTOR NOTIFIED TRACKING NUMBER: 7104223016902143683 | |
September 13, 2012 | Docket Event | UNSUCCESSFUL SERVICE Method : CIVIL AREA 2 CERTIFIED MAIL Issued : 08/10/2012 Service : CIVIL INITIAL SERVICE EFILING Served : Return : 09/13/2012 On : TENANTS IF ANY, UNKNOWN Signed By : Reason : CIVIL UNSUCCESSFUL SERVICE Comment : UNDELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED UNABLE TO FORWARD Tracking #: 7104223016902143683 | |
September 13, 2012 | Docket Event | ANSWER FILED BY PRO SE PARTY DEFENDANT SYLVESTER BALLARD TO COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.