Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Absolute Resolutions Investments Llc, filed a(n) Other Civil case represented by Carbone, Katie, against Adekoya, Rashida, in the jurisdiction of Miami County. This case was filed in Miami County Superior Courts with Wall, Stacy M presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 10, 2023 |
CategoryOther Civil |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMiami County, OH |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Return Of Service Method : Cert Mail - Mailer Issued : 08/11/2023 Service : Summons on Complaint Served : 08/16/2023 Return : 08/17/2023 on : Adekoya, Rashida Signed By : Rashida Adekoya Reason : Successful - Certified Mail Comment : Tracking #: 71902785905005288837 | |
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Copies Issued. Complaint $12.00, Service $0.10 | |
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Certified Mail Issued Issue Date: 08/11/2023 Service: Summons on Complaint Method: Cert Mail - Mailer Cost Per: 0.0000 Rashida Adekoya Mailing Address 1122 Pond View Dr Troy, OH 45373 Tracking Number: 71902785905005288837 | |
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Summons, Copy Of Complaint Issued | |
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Postage Fees | |
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Complaint Filed 08/10/2023 02:32 PM Attorney: Carbone, Katie Receipt: 180977 Date: 08/10/2023 | |
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Fees For Computerization Of Clerk's Office Receipt: 180977 Date: 08/10/2023 | |
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Special Projects Account Civil Petitions, Other Than Domestic Relations Receipt: 180977 Date: 08/10/2023 | |
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Civil Deposit Receipt: 180977 Date: 08/10/2023 | |
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Instructions For Service 08/10/2023 02:32 PM Attorney: Carbone, Katie |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.