Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
England, Rob, filed a(n) Other Civil case represented by Englert, Christopher L, against 116 W. Main Llc, represented by Gambilll, John A, Greer, David C, Greer, James H, Justice, J. Steven, Mcmurry, Glen R, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Miami County. This case was filed in Miami County Superior Courts with Wall, Stacy M presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 16, 2023 |
CategoryOther Civil |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMiami County, OH |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Intervening Plaintiffs' Memorandum In Regarding Defendant's Motion To File Supplemental Memorandum In Support Of Renewed Emergency Motion To Dissolve Agreed Preliminary Injunction And Motion For New Scheduling Order Filed with Memorandum In Support with Certificate Of Service | |
October 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Joint Motion for Entry of Consent Judgment filed with Certificate of Service 10/26/2023 02:58 PM Attorney: Justice, J. Steven | |
October 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice Of Filing Filed with Certificate of Service - Sealed - Placed on shelf (deposition of Matthew Simmons taken 10/18/23) | |
October 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Subpoena To Appear For Deposition Filed with Certificate Of Service To: Richard Osgood, Director Of Development Miami County Department Of Development 1506 One Stop Court, Suite 6 Troy, OH 45373 On: Friday, November 17, 2023 at 9:00 am | |
October 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Subpoena To Appear For Deposition Filed with Certificate Of Service To: Rob England c/o Miami County Planning Department 510 W Water St., #110 Troy, OH 45373 On: Thursday, November 16, 2023 at 10:30 am | |
October 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Rule 60(B) Motion To Relieve Rob England And Richard Osgood From Having To Comply With This Courts "Decision And Entry Overruling The Remaining Portions Of Plaintiff Rob England, In His Capacity As Chief Building Official, And Richard Osgood's Motion For Protective Orders Filed with Memorandum In Support, Certificate Of Service Attorney Kendell; Applies To: Englert, Christopher L (Attorney) on behalf of England, Rob (Plaintiff) | |
October 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Decision And Entry Granting, In Part, Plaintiff, Rob England, And Richard Osgood's Motion For Protective Orders; Establishing Briefing Schedule; Amending September 24, 2023 Scheduling Order 10/06/2023 01:50 PM Judge: Wall, Stacy M | |
October 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Defendant 116 West Main LLC's Answer to Plaintiff Rob England's Amendment of Verified Complaint for Preliminary and Permanent Injunctive Relief filed with Certificate of Service eFiling submission date: 10/03/2023 03:44 PM Attorney: McMurry, Glen R | |
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion For Protective Orders Filed with Certificate Of Service Applies To: Englert, Christopher L (Attorney) on behalf of England, Rob (Plaintiff) | |
September 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Stenographer Fees |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.