Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Bayman, Neil, filed a(n) Other Civil case represented by Lah, Jack L, against Buckeye State Mutual Insurance Company, Gb Road, Llc, Mukhtar, Abdikarim Hussen, United Healthcare, represented by Smith, Todd W., Zahniser, Dave W, in the jurisdiction of Miami County. This case was filed in Miami County Superior Courts with Wall, Stacy M presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 16, 2023 |
CategoryOther Civil |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMiami County, OH |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Order for Scheduling Conference eFiling submission date: 11/05/2023 06:18 PM Judge: Wall, Stacy M | |
November 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Judgment Entry Issued Regular Mail To Jack J. Lah, David W. Zahniser and Todd W. Smith Judge: Wall, Stacy M | |
October 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Judgment Entry Issued Regular Mail To Jack J. Lah and David W. Zahniser | |
October 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Decision and Entry Granting in Part and Overruling in Part, Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Insufficient Defenses eFiling submission date: 10/24/2023 10:34 PM Judge: Wall, Stacy M | |
October 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice Of Service 10/10/2023 04:35 PM Attorney: Smith, Todd W. | |
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Notice of Compliance filed with Certificate of Service 09/13/2023 10:05 AM Attorney: Lah, Jack L | |
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion To Strike Insufficient Defenses filed with Certificate of Service eFiling submission date: 09/13/2023 12:42 PM Attorney: Lah, Jack L | |
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice To Withdraw of Counsel Filed With Certificate of Service 08/25/2023 05:30 PM Attorney: Lah, Jack L | |
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Answer of Defendants, GB Road, LLC, and Abdikarim Hussen Mukhtar with Jury Demand Endorsed Hereon filed with Certificate of Service eFiling submission date: 08/22/2023 12:16 PM Attorney: Zahniser, Dave W | |
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Demand For Jury Trial Filed With Certificate Of Service 08/22/2023 12:16 PM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.