Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc, filed a(n) Contracts case represented by Ficker, Christine M, against Gunter, Kelley E., in the jurisdiction of Miami County. This case was filed in Miami County Superior Courts with 12/17/2018 presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 17, 2018 |
CategoryContracts |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMiami County, OH |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Praecipe for Certificate of Judgment filed by | |
March 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Security - Applied/Return | |
February 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
February 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Motion for Default Judgment and Military Affidavit filed by Attorney | |
February 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Motion for default judgment and military affidavit filed by atty | |
December 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Served by Certified Mail - | |
December 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Certified Mailer Issued | |
December 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Security |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.