Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Velocity Investments, Llc Assignee Of Prosper, filed a(n) Contracts case represented by Morris, Melissa A, against Schrubb, Nathaniel, in the jurisdiction of Miami County. This case was filed in Miami County Superior Courts with 10/23/2019 presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 17, 2018 |
CategoryContracts |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMiami County, OH |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Security - Applied/Return | |
October 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Magistrate's Decision & Entry | |
September 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Entry reassigning case from Judge Huffman to Magistrate Utrecht | |
September 13, 2019 | Docket Event | "File To Magistrate's Office" | |
September 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Motion | |
September 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Entry reassigning case from Judge Huffman to Magistrate Zuhl | |
September 13, 2019 | Docket Event | "file To Magistrate's Office" | |
August 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil Memo: | |
August 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Motion | |
August 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Entry - Notification sent of dismissing case after 10 days |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.