Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Polas, Jr., Robert N, against Puckett, Tracie, in the jurisdiction of Miami County. This case was filed in Miami County Superior Courts with 12/17/2018 presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 17, 2018 |
CategoryContracts |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationMiami County, OH |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Security - Applied/Return | |
April 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
April 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Motion | |
December 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Served by FedEx - | |
December 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Summons - FedEx | |
December 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Security | |
December 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil summons - FedEx |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.