Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Meiring, Shawn M, filed a(n) Other Civil case represented by Wollam, Shawn M, against Apex Aluminum Die Casting Co, Sarah D Morrison Administrator Bureau Of Workers, represented by Bach, Michelle D, Smart, John, in the jurisdiction of Miami County. This case was filed in Miami County Superior Courts with Wall, Stacy M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWall, Stacy M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 11, 2018 |
CategoryOther Civil |
Last RefreshedJanuary 11, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMiami County, OH |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Refund Payment to: PLEVIN & GALLUCCI | |
June 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Calling action Receipt: 153260 Date: 06/17/2020 | |
June 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Certificate of fact under seal of Court Receipt: 153260 Date: 06/17/2020 | |
May 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Dismissal Entry with prejudice. Costs to be paid by the Plaintiff Wall Receipt: 153260 Date: 06/17/2020 | |
November 04, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT APEX ALUMINUM DIE CASTING CO.'S TRIAL MATERIALS EXCHANGE FILED WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
November 01, 2019 | Docket Event | HEARING SCHEDULED: Judge: WALL, STACY M Event: Settlement Conference Date: 11/04/2019 Time: 11:00 AM Result: Vacated | |
November 01, 2019 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S SETTLEMENT REPORT FAX FILED WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
October 31, 2019 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT, APEX ALUMINUM DIE CASTING CO., INC.'S DISCLOSURE OF WITNESSES FAX FILED WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
October 25, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VIDEO TRIAL DEPOSITION OF DR. BRIAN J OLSEN, DC ON NOVEMBR 14, 2019 AT 2:30 P.M. | |
October 16, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO TAKE THE PERPETUATION DEPOSITION OF STEVEN S WUNDER M.D. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.