Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Financial Freedom Acquisition Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Donnermeyer, Nicholas D, against State Of Ohio Estate Tax Division, United States Of America, Doe, Julie, Doe, Judy, Doe, John, (total of 10) See All represented by Quinn, Patrick D, in the jurisdiction of Miami County. This case was filed in Miami County Superior Courts with Lindeman, Robert J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLindeman, Robert J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 27, 2011 |
CategoryForeclosure |
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMiami County, OH |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 19, 2012 | Docket Event | Payment to: MIAMI COUNTY RECORDER | |
April 19, 2012 | Docket Event | REFUND Payment to: LERNER SAMPSON & ROTHFUSS | |
April 19, 2012 | Docket Event | RECORDER FEES Receipt: 63650 Date: 04/19/2012 | |
April 18, 2012 | Docket Event | DEPOSIT MIAMI COUNTY SHERIFF Receipt: 63554 Date: 04/18/2012 Receipt: 63776 Date: 04/24/2012 | |
February 27, 2012 | Docket Event | ENTRY CORRECTING DISTRIBUTION LINDEMAN Receipt: 63650 Date: 04/19/2012 | |
February 10, 2012 | Docket Event | ON 2/1/12 SHERIFFS DEPT REC'D WRIT ON 2/8/12 CAUSED FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION TO HAVE FULL POSSESSION OF PREMISES SIGNED SHERIFF COX BY DESIGNEE MOORE Receipt: 63650 Date: 04/19/2012 | |
February 01, 2012 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO MIAMI CO SHERIFF Receipt: 63650 Date: 04/19/2012 | |
February 01, 2012 | Docket Event | JOURNAL ENTRY CONFIRMING SALE ORDERING DEED AND DISTRIBUTING SALE PROCEEDS LINDEMAN Receipt: 63650 Date: 04/19/2012 | |
February 01, 2012 | Docket Event | ASSIGNMENT OF BID FILED | |
December 21, 2011 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF FACT UNDER SEAL OF COURT Receipt: 63650 Date: 04/19/2012 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.