Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Household Finance Corp., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Garcia, Azalea A., in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with Raymond A. Guadagni presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 28, 2007 |
CategoryOther Contract Limited (37) - Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions55 days |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time55 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Substitution: Attorney 214810-Substitution of Attorney Filed/Issued By: 954110 - Assignee SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY [214810] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ASSIGNEE [954110] |
|
January 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Judgment: Assignment 228110-Assignment of Judgment Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT [228110] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
October 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
Writ (Filed) 236120-Writ: Filed Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff WRIT: FILED [236120] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
April 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
Writ (Issued) 236110-Writ: Issued Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff WRIT: ISSUED [236110] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
April 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs 213710-Memorandum of Costs Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff MEMORANDUM OF COSTS [213710] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
June 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
Substitution: Attorney 214810-Substitution of Attorney Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY [214810] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
February 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
Conference: Case Management 241110-Conference: Case Management; Household Finance Corp. vs. Garcia, A. ; Judge: J21130 Guadagni Raymond A. Judge: Guadagni, Raymond A. |
|
December 18, 2007 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment: Issued 227110-Abstract: Issued Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff ABSTRACT: ISSUED [227110] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
October 22, 2007 | Docket Event |
Judgment: Default 226130-Judgment: Default Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff JUDGMENT: DEFAULT [226130] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
October 22, 2007 | Docket Event |
Converted Stat Closure Disposition Date: Oct 22 2007 Type: 244210 - Judgment: Clerk Default Manner : 241210 - Before Trial: No Sttlmnt Cnf/ADR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.