Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case in the jurisdiction of Medina County, OH, . Medina County, OH Superior Courts with Hutson, William F. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 01, 2023 |
CategoryCriminal Case |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationMedina County, OH |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Jury Trial | |
November 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Pre Trial | |
November 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Subpoena(s) Returned - Good Service | |
November 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Subpoena Issued to Prosecutor | |
November 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Subpoena(s) Issued | |
October 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Recognizance of Accused Own Recognizance | |
October 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Reparation Rotary Affidavit | |
October 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Reparation Rotary Affidavit | |
October 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Recognizance of Accused Own Recognizance | |
October 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Bond Order Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.