Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Aiy Properties, Inc., filed a(n) Forcible Entry & Detainer case represented by Jordan, Samuel F, against Brooks, Michael J, in the jurisdiction of Mahoning County. This case was filed in Mahoning County Superior Courts with HUNTER (ADMINISTRATIVE), SCOTT D presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2023 |
CategoryForcible Entry & Detainer |
Last RefreshedNovember 08, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMahoning County, OH |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 27, 2023 | Docket Event | REFUND OF DEPOSIT TO: | |
September 19, 2023 | Docket Event | BK ATTACHMENT RET'D W/ DEPOSIT | |
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event | SUCCESSFUL SERVICE | |
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED MAIL ISSUED | |
August 16, 2023 | Docket Event | BANK ATTACHMENT FILED | |
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
June 12, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAIL ISSUED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.