Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Td Bank Usa, N.A., filed a(n) Complaint For Money Only case represented by Long, Soniya, against Ramirez, William, in the jurisdiction of Mahoning County. This case was filed in Mahoning County Superior Courts with HOUSER (ADMINISTRATIVE), JOSEPH M presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2023 |
CategoryComplaint For Money Only |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMahoning County, OH |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF JUDGMENT ISSUED | |
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event | CERT. OF JUDGEMENT REQ. | |
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFAULT JUDGMENT GRANTED TO THE | |
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ENTRY FILED | |
April 27, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING ISSUED | |
April 25, 2023 | Docket Event | FEE PAID FOR ALIAS BY CERTIFICATE OF MAILING. ALIAS TO BE ISSUED | |
March 28, 2023 | Docket Event | UNSUCCESSFUL SERVICE | |
March 10, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED MAIL ISSUED TO: | |
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event | ALIAS REQUEST FOR CERTIFIED MAIL TO NEW ADDRESS: | |
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event | SUCCESSFUL SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.