Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Daniel, Pamela, Daniel, Willie, filed a(n) Other Civil case represented by Bush, Emiily S, Bush, Richard T., against Abc Co, Bon Secours Mercy Health Inc, Doe, John Jane, Matak,Rn, Susan M, Mercy Health Youngstown Llc, (total of 6) See All represented by Fowler, Wm Scott, in the jurisdiction of Mahoning County. This case was filed in Mahoning County Superior Courts with DURKIN, JOHN M. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2023 |
CategoryOther Civil |
Last RefreshedNovember 10, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMahoning County, OH |
|
COMPLAINT FILED ELECTRONICALLY
Date: January 31, 2023ORDER OF MAGISTRATE (CIVIL)
Date: May 24, 2023NOTICE
Date: March 06, 2023ANSWER OF
Date: March 06, 2023JE> SEE ATTACHED IMAGE
Date: June 06, 2023ORDER OF MAGISTRATE (CIVIL)
Date: April 13, 2023NOTICE
Date: October 02, 2023ORDER OF MAGISTRATE (CIVIL)
Date: October 03, 2023ORDER OF MAGISTRATE (CIVIL)
Date: August 31, 2023NOTICE OF SERVICE OF
Date: August 04, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF
Date: March 06, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 03, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER OF MAGISTRATE (CIVIL) | |
October 03, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTIFICATION OF ORDER ISSUED TO ALL COUNSEL/PARTIES VIA EFILING SYSTEM [CERTIFICATE INCORPORATED] | |
October 03, 2023 | Docket Event | COST FOR JUDGMENT ENTRY FOR CLERK COMPUTERIZATION | |
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE | |
August 31, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER OF MAGISTRATE (CIVIL) | |
August 31, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTIFICATION OF ORDER ISSUED TO ALL COUNSEL/PARTIES VIA EFILING SYSTEM [CERTIFICATE INCORPORATED] | |
August 31, 2023 | Docket Event | COST FOR JUDGMENT ENTRY FOR CLERK COMPUTERIZATION | |
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF | |
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event | JE> SEE ATTACHED IMAGE | |
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTIFICATION OF ORDER ISSUED TO ALL COUNSEL/PARTIES VIA EFILING SYSTEM [CERTIFICATE INCORPORATED] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.