Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Weiser, Kevin K, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Devicchio, Mark, against Weiser, Taylor A, represented by Turner, Roklyn Deperro, in the jurisdiction of Mahoning County. This case was filed in Mahoning County Superior Courts with SMITH, BETH A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 08, 2022 |
CategoryDivorce With Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMahoning County, OH |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event | REFUND OF DEPOSIT TO-- | |
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FAILURE OF SERVICE | |
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event | REGULAR MAIL POSTAGE FEES | |
January 11, 2023 | Docket Event | REGULAR MAIL POSTAGE FEES | |
January 11, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEALABLE ORDER WITH RELATED PAPERS MAILED TO PARTIES AND/OR COUNSEL PER COURT ORDER | |
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER OF MAGISTRATE | |
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event | UNSUCCESSFUL SERVICE | |
December 09, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED MAILER NUMBER P | |
December 09, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS, COPY OF COMPLAINT | |
December 08, 2022 | Docket Event | JE> |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.