Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Lavelle, Mark, filed a(n) Small Claim case represented by Lavelle, Mark, against Doyle, Alex, in the jurisdiction of Mahoning County. This case was filed in Mahoning County Superior Courts with HOUSER (ADMINISTRATIVE), JOSEPH M presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 02, 2022 |
CategorySmall Claim |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMahoning County, OH |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 22, 2023 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL ENTRY - CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AT PLAINTIFF'S COSTS | |
June 22, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF | |
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR CASE STATUS SENT TO ATTORNEY AND/OR PLAINTIFF/RA | |
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event | UNSUCCESSFUL SERVICE | |
December 08, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED MAIL ISSUED TO: | |
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event | HEARING SCHEDULED | |
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIM COMPLAINT FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.