Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Aiy Properties, Inc., filed a(n) Forcible Entry & Detainer Two Defendants case represented by Jordan, Samuel F, against Escobar, Martin, Richard, Shuanell, in the jurisdiction of Mahoning County. This case was filed in Mahoning County Superior Courts with HUNTER (ADMINISTRATIVE), SCOTT D presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 02, 2022 |
CategoryForcible Entry & Detainer Two Defendants |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMahoning County, OH |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event | UNSUCCESSFUL SERVICE | |
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL ENTRY - CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AT PLAINTIFF'S COSTS. | |
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
January 11, 2023 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ENTRY | |
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED MAIL ISSUED | |
January 04, 2023 | Docket Event | HEARING SCHEDULED | |
December 28, 2022 | Docket Event | ||
December 27, 2022 | Docket Event | ALIAS REQUEST/CERT MAIL | |
December 07, 2022 | Docket Event | FAILURE OF SERVICE SENT TO ATTY / PLAINTIFF | |
December 07, 2022 | Docket Event | UNSUCCESSFUL SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.