Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Mariner Finance, Llc, filed a(n) Complaint For Money Only case represented by Wooldridge, Gregory D, against Cook, Todd J, in the jurisdiction of Mahoning County. This case was filed in Mahoning County Superior Courts with HOUSER (ADMINISTRATIVE), JOSEPH M presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2022 |
CategoryComplaint For Money Only |
Last RefreshedNovember 08, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMahoning County, OH |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 17, 2023 | Docket Event | MAILED GARNISHMENT CHECK TO | |
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
September 28, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
September 18, 2023 | Docket Event | GARNISHMENT MONEY RECEIVED FROM | |
September 11, 2023 | Docket Event | FULL RELEASE OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED TO EMPLOYER/BANK | |
September 07, 2023 | Docket Event | FULL RELEASE OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED TO EMPLOYER/BANK | |
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event | FULL RELEASE OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED TO EMPLOYER/BANK | |
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event | SUCCESSFUL SERVICE | |
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED MAIL ISSUED TO: | |
August 18, 2023 | Docket Event | ALIAS REQUEST FOR CERTIFIED MAIL TO NEW ADDRESS: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.